WA SB5028 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raising licensure limits to allow assisted living facilities to serve a higher acuity resident population.
Title
Raising licensure limits to allow assisted living facilities to serve a higher acuity resident population.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |