WA SB5074 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning coverage for biomarker testing.
Title
Concerning coverage for biomarker testing.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1450 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |