WA SB5077 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting single-use plastic straws.
Title
Prohibiting single-use plastic straws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |