WA SB5125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing consistency and efficiency in the regulation of auctioneers and auction companies, engineering and land surveying, real estate, funeral directors, and cosmetology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing consistency and efficiency in the regulation of auctioneers and auction companies, engineering and land surveying, real estate, funeral directors, and cosmetology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-11HouseCPB - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2019-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-01-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-17SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-01-10SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1176 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback