WA SB5131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county clerks duties related to recall petitions.
Title
Concerning county clerks duties related to recall petitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 92, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-15 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |