WA SB5139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning daylight saving time in Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning daylight saving time in Washington state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2019-01-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback