WA SB5159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning shoreline master program review schedules.
Title
Concerning shoreline master program review schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1544 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.