WA SB5160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Effective date 4/22/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Effective date 4/22/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing landlord-tenant relations by providing certain tenant protections during and after public health emergencies, providing for legal representation in eviction cases, and authorizing landlord access to state rental assistance programs.
Title
Addressing landlord-tenant relations by providing certain tenant protections during and after public health emergencies, providing for legal representation in eviction cases, and authorizing landlord access to state rental assistance programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Effective date 4/22/2021. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chapter 115, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Motion to not concur in House amendments failed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE COURTS
CIVIL LEGAL AID, OFFICE
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
LANDLORD AND TENANT
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
CIVIL LEGAL AID, OFFICE
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
LANDLORD AND TENANT
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 18 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 12 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 18 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 230 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 367 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 375 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |