WA SB5162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the wastewater treatment plant operator certification account.
Title
Creating the wastewater treatment plant operator certification account.
Sponsors
Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 35, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 6:40 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.