WA SB5164 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the registration of charitable organizations.
Title
Concerning the registration of charitable organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-14 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-11 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-07 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-17 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |