WA SB5175 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexual assault protection orders.
Title
Concerning sexual assault protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Nick Harper [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-25 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5175&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5175.pdf |