WA SB5210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the best interest standard for annuity transactions.
Title
Concerning the best interest standard for annuity transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |