WA SB5223 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations & State Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations & State Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing regular meetings of county legislative authorities to be held at alternate locations within the county.
Title
Authorizing regular meetings of county legislative authorities to be held at alternate locations within the county.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dansel [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] |
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5223&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5223.pdf |