WA SB5228 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding day labor construction projects and programs.
Title
Regarding day labor construction projects and programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-08 | Chapter 29, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-02 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-01 | President signed. | |
2009-03-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-23 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-23 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-09 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |