WA SB5241 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning material changes to the operations and governance structure of participants in the health care marketplace.
Title
Concerning material changes to the operations and governance structure of participants in the health care marketplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1263 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 390 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 390 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 390 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |