WA SB5245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning biosolids.
Title
Concerning biosolids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | 226 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 226 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 226 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 226 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 226 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 226 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |