WA SB5251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tourism marketing.
Title
Concerning tourism marketing.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 275, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-20 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-10 | Senate | 4th substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 4th substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | EDIT - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | CLS - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1123 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.