WA SB5268 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/1/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/1/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing equity and efficiencies in public works procurement including modifying small works roster requirements.
Title
Addressing equity and efficiencies in public works procurement including modifying small works roster requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2024*. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 395, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-17 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1306 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 335 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 10 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 50 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 22 | 620 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 23 | 352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 61 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 82 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 32 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 32 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 77 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 04 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 155 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 156 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 360 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 10 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 12 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 19 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 131 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 14 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 08 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 04 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 08 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 44 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
87 | 03 | 436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |