WA SB5272 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning heavy haul industrial corridors.
Title
Concerning heavy haul industrial corridors.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2015-06-29 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-19 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |