WA SB5280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing criminal activities occurring at rental properties.
Title
Addressing criminal activities occurring at rental properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1799 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.