WA SB5284 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning truth in music advertising.
Title
Concerning truth in music advertising.
Sponsors
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-16 | Chapter 109, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-16 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-09 | President signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-09 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |