WA SB5290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requests made by a party relating to gas or electrical company discounts for low-income senior customers and low-income customers.
Title
Concerning requests made by a party relating to gas or electrical company discounts for low-income senior customers and low-income customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-08 | Chapter 32, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-02 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-01 | President signed. | |
2009-03-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-19 | TEC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-19 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-03-02 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2009-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-28 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |