WA SB5290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing law enforcement and prosecutorial officials of federally recognized Indian tribes access to prescription monitoring data.
Title
Authorizing law enforcement and prosecutorial officials of federally recognized Indian tribes access to prescription monitoring data.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1637 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-22 - Effective date 7/24/2015.