WA SB5320 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the name of and titles within the acupuncture profession.
Title
Modifying the name of and titles within the acupuncture profession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-18 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-24 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1390 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5320&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5320.pdf |