WA SB5322 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Trade & Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Trade & Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a commission to restructure state government.
Title
Creating a commission to restructure state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-30 | Referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-11-30 | And refer to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-11-30 | WM - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2011-11-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-02-15 | And refer to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-02-15 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5322&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5322.pdf |