WA SB5322 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting dual enrollment between school employees' benefits board and public employees' benefits board programs.
Title
Prohibiting dual enrollment between school employees' benefits board and public employees' benefits board programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Chapter 18, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-15 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |