WA SB5324 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the defense community compatibility account.
Title
Concerning the defense community compatibility account.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 438, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-31 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2023-03-15 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 330 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |