WA SB5351 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the collection, sharing, and selling of consumer health data.
Title
Addressing the collection, sharing, and selling of consumer health data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1155 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5351&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5351.pdf |