WA SB5359 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Funding investigations to protect individuals with disabilities in the supported living program.
Title
Funding investigations to protect individuals with disabilities in the supported living program.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 458, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1421 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.