WA SB5364 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning court reporters, communication access real-time translation, and real-time captioning services.
Title
Concerning court reporters, communication access real-time translation, and real-time captioning services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |