WA SB5398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning unemployment benefit eligibility for apprentices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning unemployment benefit eligibility for apprentices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-17SenateChapter 50, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-17SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-21HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-19SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 11:00 AM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1438 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-22 - First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback