WA SB5421 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the upper Columbia river recreational salmon and steelhead pilot stamp program.
Title
Establishing the upper Columbia river recreational salmon and steelhead pilot stamp program.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009*. | |
2009-05-08 | Chapter 420, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-25 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; do pass NROR 09 bill proposed by Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2009-03-02 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-24 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | NROR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |