WA SB5425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning maternal mortality reviews.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning maternal mortality reviews.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 317, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-20HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-13SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-13SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-13SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1369 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5425&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5425.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5425-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5425-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5425-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118053&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5425&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118053&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5425&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118053&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5425&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback