WA SB5428 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring notification to schools regarding the release of certain offenders.
Title
Requiring notification to schools regarding the release of certain offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Nick Harper [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Val Stevens [R] | Sen. Joseph Zarelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-18 | Chapter 107, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-18 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-08 | President signed. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-18 | ELHS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-18 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-04 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2011-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-25 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |