WA SB5453 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of irrigation districts.
Title
Concerning the administration of irrigation districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 462, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |