WA SB5471 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reimbursement rate primary care providers receive to participate in medicaid.
Title
Concerning the reimbursement rate primary care providers receive to participate in medicaid.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1637 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.