WA SB5514 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning utility rates and charges for vacant mobile home lots in manufactured housing communities. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning utility rates and charges for vacant lots in manufactured housing communities. )
Title
Concerning utility rates and charges for vacant mobile home lots in manufactured housing communities. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning utility rates and charges for vacant lots in manufactured housing communities. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |