WA SB5543 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a developmentally appropriate response to youth who commit sexual offenses.
Title
Creating a developmentally appropriate response to youth who commit sexual offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1394 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 40 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 155 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 44 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 44 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 44 | 132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 44 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 44 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |