WA SB5544 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration date on the health sciences and services authority sales and use tax authorization.
Title
Extending the expiration date on the health sciences and services authority sales and use tax authorization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2128 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5544&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5544.pdf |