WA SB5562 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modernizing the control of certain communicable diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernizing the control of certain communicable diseases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1551 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback