WA SB5574 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collection agencies.
Title
Concerning collection agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-13 | Chapter 57, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-13 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-04 | President signed. | |
2011-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-08 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-08 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-02 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1745 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.