WA SB5579 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying harassment provisions.
Title
Modifying harassment provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Chapter 307, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-10 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | President signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-02 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-11 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1626 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.