WA SB5579 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting Washington management service employees the right to collectively bargain.
Title
Granting Washington management service employees the right to collectively bargain.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 06 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 80 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |