WA SB5579 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the department of ecology's authority to refrain from enforcing chapter 70A.60 RCW to mitigate the effects of supply chain problems or other similar disruptions. Revised for 1st Substitute: Expanding the department of ecology's authority to refrain from enforcing certain provisions of chapter 70A.60 RCW to mitigate the effects of supply chain problems or other similar disruptions.
Title
Expanding the department of ecology's authority to refrain from enforcing chapter 70A.60 RCW to mitigate the effects of supply chain problems or other similar disruptions. Revised for 1st Substitute: Expanding the department of ecology's authority to refrain from enforcing certain provisions of chapter 70A.60 RCW to mitigate the effects of supply chain problems or other similar disruptions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |