WA SB5585 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the future teachers conditional scholarship and loan repayment program to increase the number of early elementary teachers.
Title
Modifying the future teachers conditional scholarship and loan repayment program to increase the number of early elementary teachers.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5585&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5585.pdf |