WA SB5616 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of farm vehicles on public highways.
Title
Concerning the use of farm vehicles on public highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. John Smith [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] |
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 299, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-01 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |