WA SB5636 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fiscal notes.
Title
Concerning fiscal notes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |