WA SB5662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning cloud computing solutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning cloud computing solutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-12Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback