WA SB5674 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the aerospace training student loan program.
Title
Creating the aerospace training student loan program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-04 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1846 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-24 - Effective date 7/22/2011.