WA SB5698 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring for a skilled and trained workforce in high hazard facilities.
Title
Ensuring for a skilled and trained workforce in high hazard facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1817 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5698&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5698.pdf |